NH SB243 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2015; Chapter 0105; Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2015; Chapter 0105; Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to nonpublic sessions under the right-to-know law.
Title
Relative to nonpublic sessions under the right-to-know law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2015; Chapter 0105; Effective 01/01/2016 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-06 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG. 1779 |
2015-04-29 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 265-72; House Journal 36, PG. 1596 |
2015-04-29 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Sylvia): Motion Failed DV 160-176; House Journal 36, PG. 1596 |
2015-04-29 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Fromuth); House Journal 36, PG. 1576 |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 29 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1483 |
2015-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 4/14/2015 10:35 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/26/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing: 3/18/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6 |