NH SB242 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Sen. Feltes Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for protection of private customer information and rights of New Hampshire remote sellers in connection with certain foreign sales and use taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for protection of private customer information and rights of New Hampshire remote sellers in connection with certain foreign sales and use taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 308 N: 25 NV: 33 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateSen. Feltes Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2275h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 308-25 06/06/2019
2019-06-06HouseAmendment # 2019-2275h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-05-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2275h (NT) for 06/05/2019 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 22
2019-05-16HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-05-15HouseExecutive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-05-08HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/16/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-04-24HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-04-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-04-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-04-02HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-25HouseIntroduced 02/14/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 5 P. 80
2019-02-21SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Senate Calendar 11
2019-02-06Senate==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/13/2019, Room 100, State House, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback