NH SB242 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2014; Chapter 0191; Effective 09/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2014; Chapter 0191; Effective 09/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to coverall bingo games.
Title
Relative to coverall bingo games.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2014; Chapter 0191; Effective 09/09/2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1822e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1822eba Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 34 |
2014-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 4/29/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-04-09 | House | Executive Session: 4/15/14 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/2/2014 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0504s, 0588s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Sen. Odell Floor Amendment #2014-0588s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0504s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0504s, 2/19/14; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 1/28/14, Room 103, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Ways and Means |