NH SB242 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-25 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 3, Pg.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-25 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 3, Pg.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the administration of the Belknap county department of corrections.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the administration of the Belknap county department of corrections.
Sponsors
Sen. John Barnes [R] | Rep. Dennis Fields [R] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] | Sen. James Forsythe [R] |
Rep. Robert Greemore [R] | Rep. Colette Worsman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 3, Pg.75 | |
2012-01-19 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/25/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Hearing: 1/17/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 a.m. | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.5 |