NH SB240 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Protecting certified public accountants from prosecution or penalty for providing services to alternative treatment centers.
Title
Protecting certified public accountants from prosecution or penalty for providing services to alternative treatment centers.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Jerry Little [R] |
Sen. Molly Kelly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Died on the Table |
2015-06-03 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1934 |
2015-05-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-05-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jun 3 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1637-1638 |
2015-05-12 | House | Executive Session: 5/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-04-15 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 4/21/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-04-08 | House | Public Hearing: 4/14/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0988s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0988s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0988s, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Hearing: 3/17/15, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |