NH SB237 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to participation in the education freedom account program.
Title
Relative to participation in the education freedom account program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/16/2022; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |