NH SB236 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/31/2012; Chapter 0113; Effective 05/31/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/31/2012; Chapter 0113; Effective 05/31/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to nomination of candidates and political organizations, election procedure, and recounts.
Title
Relative to nomination of candidates and political organizations, election procedure, and recounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/31/2012; Chapter 0113; Effective 05/31/2012 | |
2012-05-30 | House Enrolled [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2495 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Barnes Concurs with House Amendment #2078h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2078h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2319-2321 | |
2012-05-15 | House Amendment #2078h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2319-2321 | |
2012-05-10 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-2078h (New Title); House Calendar 37, PG.2079-2081 | |
2012-05-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2078h(NT) for May 15 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2040 | |
2012-05-02 | House Executive Session: 5/10/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-04-04 | House Public Hearing: 4/10/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-02-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 15, PG.907 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0507s Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4, Pg.103 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Committee Amendment 0507s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 4, Pg.103 | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0507s, 2/8/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2012-01-10 | Senate Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === 1/31/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2012-01-04 | Senate Hearing: 1/31/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.5 |