NH SB232 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the issuance of a summons instead of arrest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the issuance of a summons instead of arrest.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-05-04HouseLay SB 232 on Table (Rep. Janvrin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 35
2017-04-26HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/04/2017 (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 9
2017-04-19HouseExecutive Session: 04/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-04-04HousePublic Hearing: 04/18/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-03-29HouseIntroduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 11 P. 26
2017-03-23SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10
2017-03-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15
2017-03-16SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14
2017-02-08SenateHearing: 02/14/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 10
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback