NH SB226 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - I. Section 2 Effective 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - I. Section 2 Effective 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a recruitment and retention program for state employment.
Title
Establishing a recruitment and retention program for state employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 11 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 11 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | I. Section 2 Effective 07/01/2023 |
2022-06-08 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 08/06/2022 |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0147 |
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1295s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2022-1295s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | No Pending Motion; 03/24/2022 Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 12Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 11Y-11N, Motion Failed; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/24/2022; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/12/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |