NH SB22 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0143; Effective 08/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0143; Effective 08/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain changes in the law governing the therapeutic use of cannabis.
Title
Relative to certain changes in the law governing the therapeutic use of cannabis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0143; Effective 08/11/2015 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/28/2015); Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Concurs with House Amendment #1251h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1251h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1560 |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment #1251h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1560 |
2015-04-15 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep Kotowski); House Journal 34, PG. 1534 |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1251h for Apr 15 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1304 |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 4/7/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-25 | House | ==CANCELED==Executive Session: 4/2/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 26, PG. 1274 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0640s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0640s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0640s, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 2/3/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |