NH SB219 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - House Conference Committee Report: Not Signed Off
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - House Conference Committee Report: Not Signed Off
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to guaranteed issue for health insurance.
Title
Relative to guaranteed issue for health insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Flanders [R] | Rep. James Headd [R] | Sen. Matthew Houde [D] | Rep. John Hunt [R] |
Sen. Raymond White [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | House Conference Committee Report: Not Signed Off | |
2012-05-25 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/29/2012, 2:00 p.m., Room 103, State House | |
2012-05-24 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Hunt, Flanders, Manuse, and Taylor [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2493 | |
2012-05-24 | House House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2493 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate President Appoints: Senators White, DeBlois, and Houde | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Prescott Moved Non-concur with House Amendment #2178h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2178h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2294-2296 | |
2012-05-15 | House Amendment #2178h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2294-2296 | |
2012-05-10 | House Proposed Minority Committee Amendment #2012-2118h; House Calendar 37, PG.2069-2070 | |
2012-05-10 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2118h; House Calendar 37, PG.2037 | |
2012-05-10 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2012-2178h (New Title); House Calendar 37, PG.2068-2069 | |
2012-05-10 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2178h(NT) for May 15 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2037 | |
2012-05-09 | House Executive Session: 5/9/2012 Legislative Office Building 302 Immediately Following House Session | |
2012-05-02 | House Executive Session: 5/8/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 ==Recessed== | |
2012-05-02 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/8/2012 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-04-27 | House ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 5/3/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-04-17 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/1/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-04-17 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/24/2012 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-03-27 | House Public Hearing: 4/12/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302-304 ==Insurance/Consumer Protection Div== | |
2012-03-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 23, PG.1447 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 15Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6, Pg.152 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Sen. White Moved to Suspend Rule 3-7 to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 0954s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6, Pg.151 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment 0954s; Senate Journal 6, Pg.151 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0954s, 3/7/12; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2012-01-04 | Senate Hearing: 1/10/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1, Pg.3 |