NH SB217 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB217
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Reconsider Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 177-185 05/23/2024 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Reconsider Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 177-185 05/23/2024 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a rural and underserved area educator incentive program for higher education and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing a rural and underserved area educator incentive program for higher education and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - House - ITL (Y: 184 N: 174 NV: 22 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | House | Reconsider Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 177-185 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 |
2024-05-23 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-174 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 |
2024-05-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2024-05-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 05/15/2024 (Vote 13-12; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 17 |
2024-05-13 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division III Work Session: 05/14/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-05-08 | House | Executive Session: 05/14/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-05-02 | House | Division II Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2024-05-02 | House | Referred to Finance 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 |
2024-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1602h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 |
2024-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2024-1602h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1602h 04/23/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 6 |
2024-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/22/2024 12:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-04-05 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/09/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 6 P. 138 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0382s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0382s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0382s, 02/08/2024, Vote 6-1; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/03/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB217 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10