NH SB216 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - III. Remainder Effective 08/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - III. Remainder Effective 08/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an autonomous vehicle advisory commission, establishing an autonomous vehicle testing pilot program, and providing requirements for automated vehicle deployment.
Title
Establishing an autonomous vehicle advisory commission, establishing an autonomous vehicle testing pilot program, and providing requirements for automated vehicle deployment.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Peter Somssich [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 260 N: 92 NV: 13 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-05 | Senate | III. Remainder Effective 08/02/2019 |
2019-08-05 | Senate | II. RSA 242:1 IX-XII, as inserted by section 4, shall take effect 07/01/2021 |
2019-08-05 | Senate | I. RSA 242:1 I-VIII XIII and XIV, as inserted by section 4, shall take effect 09/01/2019 |
2019-08-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2019; Chapter 310 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2672e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2672e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2549c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report 2549c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 260-92 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 13 |
2019-06-20 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2549c Filed 06/13/2019; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2019-06-17 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. O'Brien Replaces Rep. Telerski 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 20 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/18/2019, 09:00 am, Room 101, Legislative Office Building |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Sykes, Steven Smith, Telerski, Pickering 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 45 |
2019-06-12 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Sykes): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 45 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Watters, Birdsell, Levesque; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1604h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 27 |
2019-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2019-1604h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 27 |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1604h (NT) for 05/02/2019 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 12 |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/23/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-04-11 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 04/16/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-04-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-04-02 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 04/09/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0827s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0827s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0827s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |