NH SB214 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the transfer of skilled nursing facility beds from the Franklin Regional Hospital.
Title
Relative to the transfer of skilled nursing facility beds from the Franklin Regional Hospital.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 46 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 8 |
2015-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 11/5/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-09-29 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 11/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-08-12 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/15/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-05-12 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/19/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-04-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 4/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0993s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0993s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0993s, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0634s, New Title, Regular Calendar 5Y-19N, Amendment Failed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0634s, New Title, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Hearing: 2/10/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |