NH SB210 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 245; Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 245; Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to emergency medical and trauma services.
Title
Relative to emergency medical and trauma services.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. George Sykes [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] |
Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Rep. Charles McMahon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 245; Effective 07/12/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1376h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 5 |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-1376h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 5 |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1376h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5 |
2019-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0511s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0511s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0511s, 02/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/13/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 11:30 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |