NH SB209 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the tobacco use prevention and cessation program.
Title
Relative to the tobacco use prevention and cessation program.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Rep. James MacKay [D] |
Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Carolyn Gargasz [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/21/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |