NH SB206 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Excluding the cost of lobbying and political activity from the rates of public utilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excluding the cost of lobbying and political activity from the rates of public utilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateSen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-05-22HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-22HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 20
2019-05-08HouseExecutive Session: 05/15/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-05-08HousePublic Hearing: 05/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-05-08HouseReferred to Science, Technology and Energy 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 3
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1474h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 3
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1474h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 3
2019-04-24HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1474h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 3
2019-04-16HouseExecutive Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-02HousePublic Hearing: 04/09/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14
2019-03-06Senate==RECONVENE== Hearing: 03/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-21Senate==RECESSED== Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback