NH SB205 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 205 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 205 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to energy efficiency programs funded from the systems benefits charge and the duties and members of the energy efficiency and sustainable energy board.
Title
Relative to energy efficiency programs funded from the systems benefits charge and the duties and members of the energy efficiency and sustainable energy board.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
Rep. Jon Morgan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 197 N: 127 NV: 46 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 197 N: 127 NV: 46 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 205 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22 |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 07/19/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1640h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 197-127 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 94 |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-1640h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 94 |
2019-05-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-05-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1640h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 18 |
2019-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-1179s and 2019-1346s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2019-1346s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1179s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1179s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |