NH SB205 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB205
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-30 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-30 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the small business jobs fund and tax credit.
Title
Establishing the small business jobs fund and tax credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] |
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Patrick Abrami [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-30 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-10-12 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-10-04 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2017 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-09-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-09-19 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/27/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-08-15 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/19/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-04-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | Executive Session: 04/20/2017 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 11 P. 26 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1014s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1014s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1014s, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Hearing: 02/08/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB205 (Carry Over) 2017-10-30 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)