NH SB204 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Lay on Table (Rep. Carson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to encouraging the development of electrical energy storage by both private market participants and regulated electric utility companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to encouraging the development of electrical energy storage by both private market participants and regulated electric utility companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 223 N: 129 NV: 18 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseLay on Table (Rep. Carson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019
2019-05-29HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-29HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 18
2019-05-17HouseExecutive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-05-08HousePublic Hearing: 05/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-05-08HouseReferred to Municipal and County Government 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 42
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1750h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 223-129 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 42
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1750h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 42
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1750h (NT) for 05/08/2019 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 11
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-04HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1178s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1178s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1178s, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-21SenateHearing: 03/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback