NH SB202 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a stormwater management and flood resilience fund within the department of environmental services and making an appropriation to the fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a stormwater management and flood resilience fund within the department of environmental services and making an appropriation to the fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0369s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0369s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0369s, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-24SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, State House, 11:40 am; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback