NH SB200 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 243; Effective 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to wildlife corridors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to wildlife corridors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 243; Effective 09/10/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 11
2019-05-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 9-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 21
2019-05-08HouseExecutive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-05-08HousePublic Hearing: 05/21/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-05-08HouseReferred to Transportation 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 24
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1529h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 24
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1529h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 24
2019-04-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-04-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1529h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 9
2019-04-16HouseExecutive Session: 04/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-03-27House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/09/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-02House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0364s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0364s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0364s, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-30SenateHearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback