NH SB200 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Public Hearing: 03/15/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to incarceration for nonpayment of an assessment or nonperformance of community service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to incarceration for nonpayment of an assessment or nonperformance of community service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-07HousePublic Hearing: 03/15/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Judiciary
2017-02-16SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6
2017-02-09SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2017-02-01SenateHearing: 02/07/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 9
2017-01-30SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback