NH SB200 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to newborn screening for Krabbe Leukodystrophy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to newborn screening for Krabbe Leukodystrophy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-15HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1545
2015-04-09HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Apr 15 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1304-1305
2015-04-01HouseExecutive Session: 4/7/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2015-03-25House==CANCELED==Executive Session: 4/2/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2015-03-19HousePublic Hearing: 3/26/2015 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2015-03-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 26, PG. 1275
2015-03-12SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8
2015-03-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/12/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12
2015-01-26SenateHearing:=== RESCHEDULED === 2/5/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8
2015-01-22SenateHearing:=== CANCELLED === 1/27/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback