NH SB196 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Senate Law Without Signature 7/14/11; Eff. Date 07/01/11, Chapter 0267; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Senate Law Without Signature 7/14/11; Eff. Date 07/01/11, Chapter 0267; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the renomination or reelection of teachers and grievance procedures.
Title
Relative to the renomination or reelection of teachers and grievance procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Senate - Conference Committee Report 2461 (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - OTP/AM 1895H(NT) (Y: 253 N: 105 NV: 38 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - OTP/AM 1895H(NT) (Y: 253 N: 105 NV: 38 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-14 | Senate Law Without Signature 7/14/11; Eff. Date 07/01/11, Chapter 0267; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1859 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2461c; Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Adopted | |
2011-06-22 | House Conference Committee Report #2461c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 57, PG.1817-1818 | |
2011-06-16 | House Conference Committee Report #2011-2461c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 49, PG.1675-1676 | |
2011-06-14 | Senate Conferee Change; Senator Bragdon Replaces Senator Kelly | |
2011-06-13 | Senate C of C Meeting: == RECONVENE === 6/14/2011, 2:30 p.m., Room 103, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-06-09 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: == RECESSED === 6/13/2011, 3:00 p.m., Room 103, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-06-08 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Balboni, Boehm, Hill, and Gile; House Journal 51, PG.1723 | |
2011-06-08 | House House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Balboni): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1723 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Stiles, Forsythe and Kelly; Senate Journal 20, Pg.549 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Sen. Stiles Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1895h; New Title, Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.549 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1895h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 253-105; House Journal 44, PG.1543-1546 | |
2011-05-18 | House Amendment #1895h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1543-1544 | |
2011-05-12 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 39, PG.1324 | |
2011-05-12 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-1895h (New Title); House Calendar 39, PG.1349-1350 | |
2011-05-12 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1895h(NT) for May 18 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1324 | |
2011-04-27 | House Executive Session: 5/10/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-04-05 | House Public Hearing: 4/28/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-03-31 | House Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 35, PG.1241 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.240 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1223s, New Title, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.229 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Sen. Forsythe Floor Amendment #2011-1223s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.228 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Sen. Forsythe Moved to Suspend Rule 3-7 to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 1223s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.227 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Sen. Forsythe moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 11, Pg.227 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.227 | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/30/11; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Hearing: 3/22/11, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 8, Pg.82 |