NH SB194 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2019; Chapter 309; Effective 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the insurance data security law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the insurance data security law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 210 N: 142 NV: 13 Abs: 33) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05SenateSigned by the Governor on 08/02/2019; Chapter 309; Effective 01/01/2020
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2668e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-09HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2668e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-27SenateConference Committee Report # 2019-2609c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseConference Committee Report 2609c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 210-142 06/27/2019
2019-06-20HouseConference Committee Report # 2019-2609c Filed 06/13/2019; House Amendment + New Amendment
2019-06-19Senate==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2019, 12:00 pm, Room 101, Legislative Office Building
2019-06-19Senate==RECESSED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2019, 10:00 am, Room 101, Legislative Office Building
2019-06-13HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Butler, Williams, Indruk, Herbert 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47
2019-06-13HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47
2019-06-13SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Cavanaugh, Morgan, Morse; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-13SenateSen. Cavanaugh Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1607h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 34
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-1607h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 34
2019-05-29HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-29HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1607h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 10
2019-05-08HouseExecutive Session: 05/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-05-08HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/16/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-17House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/25/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/25/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-09HousePublic Hearing: 04/16/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1044s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateSen. Morgan Floor Amendment # 2019-1044s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback