NH SB193 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB193

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Division II Work Session: 10/17/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building209
Hearing: Oct 17 @ 1:00 am in PM Legislative Office Building209
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing education freedom savings accounts for students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing education freedom savings accounts for students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Reconsider (Y: 165 N: 172 NV: 24 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Interim Study (Y: 170 N: 159 NV: 37 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Table (Y: 15 N: 314 NV: 37 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2018-01-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 184 N: 162 NV: 15 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 161 N: 175 NV: 25 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20HouseDivision II Work Session: 10/17/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building209
2018-09-20HouseExecutive Session: 10/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building210-211
2018-05-03HouseReconsider SB 193 (Rep. Shurtleff): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 165-172 05/03/2018
2018-05-02HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-159 05/02/2018
2018-05-02HouseLay SB 193 on Table (Rep. Scruton): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 15-314 05/02/2018
2018-04-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1289h (NT)
2018-04-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 05/02/2018 (Vote 14-12; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 19
2018-04-19HouseExecutive Session: 04/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-12HouseDivision II Work Session: 04/17/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209
2018-04-05HouseDivision II Work Session: 04/10/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
2018-03-14HouseDivision II Work Session: 04/04/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
2018-03-12House==RESCHEDULED== Division II Work Session: 03/14/2018 10:05 am Legislative Office Building 209
2018-03-07House==CANCELLED== Division II Work Session: 03/13/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209
2018-03-07HouseDivision II Work Session: 03/09/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-03-02HouseExecutive Session: 03/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-03-01HouseDivision II Work Session: 03/09/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
2018-03-01House==CANCELLED== Division II Work Session: 03/08/2018 04:30 PM Legislative Office Building 212
2018-03-01HousePublic Hearing: 03/09/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-02-28HouseDivision II Work Session: 02/28/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 209
2018-02-13HouseDivision II Work Session: 02/20/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209
2018-02-06HouseDivision II Work Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
2018-01-30House==CONTINUED== Division II Work Session: 02/01/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209
2018-01-30House==RECESSED== Division II Work Session: 01/30/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-01-30HouseDivision II Work Session: 02/06/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
2018-01-24House==CONTINUED== Division II Work Session: 01/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
2018-01-24House==CANCELLED== Division II Work Session: 01/30/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209
2018-01-17House==RECESSED== Division II Work Session: 01/24/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209
2018-01-11HouseDivision II Work Session: 01/23/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209
2018-01-05HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-01-03HouseReferred to Finance 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 102
2018-01-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2530h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-162 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 100
2018-01-03HouseFLAM # 2018-0012h (Rep. Tanner): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 161-175 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 98
2018-01-03HouseAmendment # 2018-2530h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 92
2017-11-15HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-11-15HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-2530h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar)
2017-11-08House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 11/14/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2017-10-02House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 11/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2017-09-25HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2017-09-06HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2017-08-23HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2017-07-25House==RESCHEDULED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 08/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2017-07-20House==CANCELLED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 08/15/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2017-05-24HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 06/08/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2017-04-25HouseRetained in Committee
2017-04-11HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/19/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2017-04-05House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/25/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2017-03-29HousePublic Hearing: 04/04/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2017-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/09/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 10 P. 77
2017-03-16SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14
2017-02-23SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-0500s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
2017-02-23SenateCommittee Amendment # 2017-0500s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
2017-02-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0500s, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11
2017-01-31SenateHearing: 02/07/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 9
2017-01-30SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5

Same As/Similar To

SB193 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=912&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB193
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=914&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=914
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=11&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0193&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB193&ddlsponsors=&lsr=912
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=12&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0193&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB193&ddlsponsors=&lsr=912
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=21&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0193&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB193&ddlsponsors=&lsr=912
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=49&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0193&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB193&ddlsponsors=&lsr=912
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=209&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0193&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB193&ddlsponsors=&lsr=912
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=210&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0193&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB193&ddlsponsors=&lsr=912
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=213&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0193&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB193&ddlsponsors=&lsr=912

Bill Comments

feedback