NH SB19 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB19
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 19 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/16/2020; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 19 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/16/2020; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the privacy of certain information concerning public employees.
Title
Relative to the privacy of certain information concerning public employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-16 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 218 N: 148 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 148 N: 216 NV: 4 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2020-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 218 N: 148 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 148 N: 216 NV: 4 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 19 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/16/2020; Senate Journal 10 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 07/17/2020 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Sen. Cavanaugh Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2805h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 218-148 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 13 |
2020-01-09 | House | Amendment # 2019-2830h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 148-216 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 13 |
2020-01-09 | House | Amendment # 2019-2805h: Amendment Adopted DV 209-143 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 13 |
2019-11-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2830h |
2019-11-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2805h (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 26 |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-10-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-05-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/01/2019 09:35 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 05/01/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/24/2019 08:45 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-04-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/17/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 68 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0381s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Sen. French Floor Amendment # 2019-0513s, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Amendment Failed; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0381s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Special Order to After Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0381s, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Hearing: 01/22/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:45 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB19 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2830h