NH SB189 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0215; Effective 09/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0215; Effective 09/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to liquor manufacturers.
Title
Relative to liquor manufacturers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. John Hunt [R] | Rep. Frederick Rice [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Rep. Naida Kaen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0215; Effective 09/04/2015 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2102 |
2015-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1826 |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jun 3 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1629 |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session: 5/12/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing: 3/17/15, Room 100, State House, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |