NH SB186 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the tax characterization of stormwater utility fees.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the tax characterization of stormwater utility fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: ===RECONVENE=== 02/15/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: ===RECESSED=== 02/01/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 5 |