NH SB185 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB185
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to protective services for vulnerable adults and the definition of abandonment.
Title
Relative to protective services for vulnerable adults and the definition of abandonment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB185 (Carry Over) 2023-02-22 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8