NH SB185 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-20 - Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 11/8/11, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-20 - Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 11/8/11, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a restitution fund for victims of financial fraud and continually appropriating a special fund.
Title
Establishing a restitution fund for victims of financial fraud and continually appropriating a special fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-20 | Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 11/8/11, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 43 | |
2011-09-01 | Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 9/8/11, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 36 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.89 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Hearing: 2/24/11, Room 100, State House, 10:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration, Senate Journal 5, Pg.47 |