NH SB183 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0036; Effective 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0036; Effective 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing the fish and game department to offer lifetime hunting and fishing licenses for newborns.
Title
Allowing the fish and game department to offer lifetime hunting and fishing licenses for newborns.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Rep. Joe Duarte [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Rep. David Kidder [R] | Rep. James Webb [R] | Sen. Jerry Little [R] | Rep. Kenneth Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0036; Effective 07/01/2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 4/9/2015); Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-29 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 36, PG. 1597 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1539 |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1303 |
2015-03-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/31/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing: 3/26/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources; House Journal 26, PG. 1274 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0456s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0456s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0456s, 3/5/15; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/4/15, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |