NH SB181 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to registration fees for hunter education programs of the fish and game department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to registration fees for hunter education programs of the fish and game department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-15 - House - Table (Y: 188 N: 158 NV: 10 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-18HouseDied on the Table
2015-04-15HouseLay on Table (Rep Kidder): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-158; House Journal 34, PG. 1556-1558
2015-04-15HouseFloor Amendment #1318h (Reps C. McGuire, Spillane): Amendment Adopted DV 183-162; House Journal 34, PG. 1556
2015-04-08HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2015-04-08HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 9-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1309
2015-03-26HouseExecutive Session: 3/31/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2015-03-18HousePublic Hearing: 3/26/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2015-03-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources; House Journal 26, PG. 1275
2015-03-12SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8
2015-03-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12
2015-02-12SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 5
2015-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/12/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9
2015-01-29SenateHearing: 2/4/15, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback