NH SB181 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to restitution payments to financial resources management lenders.
Title
Relative to restitution payments to financial resources management lenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/7/13; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 2/20/13, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin; Senate Journal 5 |