NH SB18 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 04/28/2011; Effective 06/27/2011; Chapter 0023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 04/28/2011; Effective 06/27/2011; Chapter 0023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a function of the central tax services unit.
Title
Deleting a function of the central tax services unit.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 04/28/2011; Effective 06/27/2011; Chapter 0023 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 14, Pg.273 | |
2011-04-13 | House Enrolled ; House Journal 37, PG.1305 | |
2011-04-13 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 37, Pg.1296 | |
2011-04-05 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 13 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31, PG.1040 | |
2011-03-30 | House Executive Session: 4/5/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-03-10 | House Public Hearing: 3/22/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-02-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 19, Pg. 438 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution, Senate Journal 6, Pg.61 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg, Senate Journal 6, Pg.59 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/16/2011; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Hearing: 2/8/11, Room 100 State House, 1:05 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2011-01-04 | Senate Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Ways & Means, Senate Journal 1, Pg.20 |