NH SB179 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-16 - Notwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall SB 179 Become Law: Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; Senate Journal 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to eligibility to vote and relative to availability of voter information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to eligibility to vote and relative to availability of voter information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-16 - Senate - Notwithstanding the Governor's veto shall the bill become law? (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Ought to Pass Amended (Y: 211 N: 145 NV: 10 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1025s (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-16SenateNotwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall SB 179 Become Law: Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; Senate Journal 20
2015-07-13SenateVetoed by Governor 07/10/2015
2015-06-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19
2015-06-29HouseEnrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2139
2015-06-24SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2293e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19
2015-06-18HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2293EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/11/2015); House Journal 46, PG. 1993
2015-06-04SenateSen. Birdsell Concurs with House Amendment #1944h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17
2015-06-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #1944h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 211-145; House Journal 44, PG. 1908-1915
2015-06-03HouseAmendment #1944h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1908-1913
2015-05-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2015-05-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1944h (NT) for Jun 3 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1635-1636
2015-05-20HouseContinued Executive Session: 5/27/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2015-04-21HouseContinued Executive Session: 4/29/2015 1:55 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2015-04-15HouseExecutive Session: 4/21/2015 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308==RECESSED==
2015-04-01HousePublic Hearing: 4/7/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2015-03-31HouseIntroduced and Referred to Election Law (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299
2015-03-26SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1025s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10
2015-03-26SenateCommittee Amendment 1025s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Amendment Adopted
2015-03-18SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1025s, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14
2015-03-11SenateHearing: 3/18/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=907&sy=2015&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2015&q=1
Texthttp://www.gencourt.state.nh.us/legislation/2015/SB0179.html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=51&sy=2015&lb=S&eb=SB0179&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2015&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=907
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=52&sy=2015&lb=S&eb=SB0179&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2015&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=907
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=161&sy=2015&lb=H&eb=SB0179&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2015&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=907
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=113&sy=2015&lb=S&eb=SB0179&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2015&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=907

Bill Comments

feedback