NH SB179 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2011; Effective 08/07/2011; Chapter 0155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2011; Effective 08/07/2011; Chapter 0155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to qualified purchasing alliances.
Title
Relative to qualified purchasing alliances.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Andolina [R] | Rep. Dorothea Hooper [D] | Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] | Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] |
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2011; Effective 08/07/2011; Chapter 0155 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 20, Pg.547 | |
2011-06-01 | House Enrolled; House Journal 48, PG.1669 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1532 | |
2011-05-12 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 18 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1319-1320 | |
2011-05-04 | House Executive Session: 5/10/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 1:30 PM)== | |
2011-05-04 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 5/10/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 Insurance/Consumer Div | |
2011-05-03 | House ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 5/10/2011 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 Insurance/Consumer Div | |
2011-04-12 | House Public Hearing: 4/28/2011 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==Work Session May Follow== | |
2011-03-31 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 35, PG.1241 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.240 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1178s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.207 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee Amendment 1178s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.206 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1178s, 3/30/11; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/15/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Senate Journal 3, Pg.39 |