NH SB178 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Hearing: Apr 25 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to telemedicine for spectacle and contact lenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to telemedicine for spectacle and contact lenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-20HousePublic Hearing: 03/27/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced 03/14/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 9 P. 53
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateSpecial Order to the Present Time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-24SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:50 pm; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback