NH SB177 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB177
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To create orthotics and prosthetics parity and ensure coverage of orthotics and prosthetics for the performance of physical activities for children 18 years of age and younger.
Title
To create orthotics and prosthetics parity and ensure coverage of orthotics and prosthetics for the performance of physical activities for children 18 years of age and younger.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/08/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB177 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10