NH SB177 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Signed by the Governor on 05/09/2017; Chapter 0040; Effective 05/09/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Signed by the Governor on 05/09/2017; Chapter 0040; Effective 05/09/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Naming a bridge in Groveton in honor of George Langley and Lyle Hersom.
Title
Naming a bridge in Groveton in honor of George Langley and Lyle Hersom.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Herbert Richardson [R] | Rep. Troy Merner [R] | Rep. Wayne Moynihan [D] |
Rep. Robert Theberge [R] | Rep. Edith Tucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/09/2017; Chapter 0040; Effective 05/09/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-03 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 26 |
2017-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 9 |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2017 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 7 |
2017-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2017 Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-03-28 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 8 P. 46 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Special Order SB 177 to after SB 180, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2017; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |