NH SB177 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to tip pooling.
Title
Relative to tip pooling.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Andre Martel [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] |
Rep. William Infantine [R] | Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] | Rep. Laura Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1 |
2015-11-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; 1/6/16; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 3/2/15, Room 100, State House, 2:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |