NH SB177 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-25 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; 1/6/16; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to tip pooling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to tip pooling.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-25SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study; 1/6/16; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49
2015-03-12SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 8
2015-03-04SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12
2015-02-20SenateHearing: 3/2/15, Room 100, State House, 2:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback