NH SB175 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of blighted property.
Title
Relative to the regulation of blighted property.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Joseph Lachance [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1 |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; 1/6/16; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 6 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 2/19/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/4/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |