NH SB175 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-19 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; 1/6/16; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the regulation of blighted property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the regulation of blighted property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-19SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; 1/6/16; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49
2015-02-19SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 6
2015-02-12SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 2/19/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2015-01-29SenateHearing: 2/4/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback