NH SB173 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of accessory dwelling units.
Title
Relative to the use of accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. James Belanger [R] | Rep. Rebecca Mcbeath [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] | Rep. Bill Ohm [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |