NH SB170 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Signed by the Governor on 07/20/2015; Chapter 0268; Effective 07/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Signed by the Governor on 07/20/2015; Chapter 0268; Effective 07/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the public utilities commission to ensure ratepayer protections with electric power suppliers and extending the time for the site evaluation committee to adopt certain rules.
Title
Requiring the public utilities commission to ensure ratepayer protections with electric power suppliers and extending the time for the site evaluation committee to adopt certain rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/20/2015; Chapter 0268; Effective 07/20/2015 |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-07-09 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2142 |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2342e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2342e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2140 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2125c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2125c: Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 54, PG. 2110-2111 |
2015-06-15 | House | Conference Committee Report #2015-2125CofC Filed; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/10/2015, 1:00 p.m., Room 101, Legislative Office Building |
2015-06-09 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps D. Thomas, Baber, Richardson, Devine (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1953 |
2015-06-09 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference (Rep Gorman): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1953 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Prescott, and Feltes |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1286h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-04-29 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1286h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1579 |
2015-04-29 | House | Amendment #1286h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1579 |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1286h for Apr 29 (Vote 13-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1484 |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 4/9/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy (in recess of 3/12/2015); House Journal 26, PG. 1276 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 0731s and 1056s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Floor Amendment #2015-1056s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 1056s, New Title, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Chair Ruled Floor Amendment Non-Germane |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Offered Floor Amendment #2015-1056s, New Title |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0731s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Special Order SB 170 to the end of the Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0731s, 3/19/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Special Order SB 170 to 3/19/15, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0731s, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 1/21/15, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |