NH SB170 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2013; Chapter 0224; Effective 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2013; Chapter 0224; Effective 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to advance directives pertaining to life-sustaining treatment.
Title
Relative to advance directives pertaining to life-sustaining treatment.
Sponsors
Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Rick Watrous [D] | Rep. Laurie Harding [D] |
Rep. Lucy Weber [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2013; Chapter 0224; Effective 01/01/2014 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1712 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2180e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2180e Adopted [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2083e Adopted |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2083e Adopted; House Journal 49, PG.1656 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Moved Concur with House Amendment 1303h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1303h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 244-90; House Journal 41, PG.1412-1414 |
2013-05-08 | House | Lay on the Table (Rep Itse): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 125-209; House Journal 41, PG.1412-1414 |
2013-05-08 | House | Amendment #1303h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1412 |
2013-05-08 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Peterson); House Journal 41, PG.1386 |
2013-04-23 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1303h; House Calendar36, PG.1221 |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1303h for May 8 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1196 |
2013-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 4/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 31, PG.1076 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0852s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0852s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0852s, 3/21/13; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 3/5/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |