NH SB167 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2017; Chapter 0085; Effective 06/02/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2017; Chapter 0085; Effective 06/02/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the burden of proof in termination of parental rights cases.
Title
Relative to the burden of proof in termination of parental rights cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2017; Chapter 0085; Effective 06/02/2017 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-11 | House | Enrolled 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 47 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1569e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1569e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 25 |
2017-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 2 |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2017 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 3 |
2017-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-03-16 | House | Public Hearing: 03/21/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/23/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |