NH SB167 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-18 - Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 2, Pg.69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-18 - Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 2, Pg.69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a production jobs creation credit under the business enterprise tax and making changes affecting small business to the business profits tax, the business enterprise tax, and the meals and rooms tax.
Title
Establishing a production jobs creation credit under the business enterprise tax and making changes affecting small business to the business profits tax, the business enterprise tax, and the meals and rooms tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 2, Pg.69 | |
2012-01-12 | Senate Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.145 | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/7/11, Room 100, State House, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means, Senate Journal 5, Pg.46 |